Financial history ST KEW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1023064
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £982 £1.93k £1.06k £1.10k £936
Total expenditure £1.51k £1.76k £1.11k £1.10k £951
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A