Financial history CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST, WEST LONDON PARISH

Charity number: 1023139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £55.21k £42.12k £76.71k £59.26k £90.14k
Total expenditure £38.64k £26.39k £45.16k £55.52k £57.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A