Financial history FRIENDS OF TOTTENHAM PARK CEMETERY

Charity Number: 1023352
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £2.39k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.69k £1.76k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A