Financial history BRAY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1023381
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £75.19k £86.68k £91.95k £103.82k £112.23k
Total expenditure £68.02k £80.47k £90.52k £95.35k £109.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.12k £63.71k £56.79k £1.00k £70.35k