Accounts and annual returns BUMBLES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1023386
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 24 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 16 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required