Financial history The Stelling Minnis School PTA

Charity Number: 1023450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.65k £1.57k £6.94k £11.80k £7.67k
Total expenditure £16.46k £2.10k £6.03k £12.02k £4.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A