Trustees SHEFFIELD TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1024087

Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Margaret Edmonds Satyajyoti | Chair | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Cooke | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dh. Vimaladasa Brazier | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wells | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prajnasri Tracey Louise Dibble | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Walch | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DHARMACHARI BODHINAGA | Trustee | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DHARMACHARINI PUNYAMALA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DHARMACHARI VADANYA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DHARMACHARINI SURYAMATI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DHARMACHARINI KHEMASURI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.