Trustees DOVESIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1024304

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanda Philliskirk | Chair | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cornes | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Smith | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Holmes | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Dickinson | Trustee | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Clarke | Trustee | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Baxter | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Clarke | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Marriott | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Styne | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gina Wellsteed | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hulcoop | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Val Burns | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debra Joy Childs | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.