Accounts and annual returns DOLWEN LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity Number: 1024732
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 13 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 13 September 2022 21 July 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 13 September 2021 10 August 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 13 September 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 13 September 2019 10 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 September 2019 Not Required