Accounts and annual returns RIPON CENTRE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity Number: 1025030
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 14 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 15 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 14 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 18 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | 11 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window