Accounts and annual returns RAVENSDALE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1025077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 17 October 2022 27 July 2024 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 17 October 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 17 October 2020 15 March 2022 210 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 17 October 2019 30 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 October 2019 Not Required