Accounts and annual returns MAHA SHIV SHAKTI MANDIR

Charity number: 1025089
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 April 2025 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 April 2025 441 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 April 2025 806 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required