Financial history HORSE AID CARE KNOWLEDGE

Charity number: 1025157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £135.00k £24.61k £32.67k £59.64k £46.11k
Total expenditure £75.09k £35.87k £33.31k £60.16k £33.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A