Accounts and annual returns HACKNESS AND DISTRICT UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1025461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 April 2024 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 April 2024 67 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window