Financial history RAMSDEN BELLHOUSE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1025468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £27.44k £20.57k £12.13k £28.53k £18.97k
Total expenditure £23.05k £24.97k £20.22k £34.27k £18.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k N/A