Accounts and annual returns COLESHILL STROKE CLUB

Charity Number: 1025544
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required