Accounts and annual returns LAKESIDE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity Number: 1025714
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 18 December 2015 08 February 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 December 2015 08 February 2017 113 days late
Annual return 31 July 2014 23 October 2015 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 23 October 2015 145 days late
Annual return 31 July 2013 31 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 21 October 2015 508 days late