Accounts and annual returns GOOD SAMARITANS SOCIAL DEVELOPEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026014
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 28 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required