Financial history UPOTTERY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.48k £3.50k £4.71k £7.68k £10.53k
Total expenditure £9.50k £2.60k £5.49k £6.97k £3.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A