Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST JEROME'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2022 332 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required