Financial history WORKSOP AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1026290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £5.23k £1.02k £1.89k £3.96k £7.68k
Total expenditure £4.86k £2.34k £2.90k £2.48k £2.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A