Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S PLAYGROUP (LYMM)

Charity number: 1026307
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On Time