Accounts and annual returns LONGRIDGE C E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2021 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 December 2021 519 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required