Financial history BRIGHTLINGSEA PLAYCENTRE

Charity number: 1026524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £206.05k £162.96k £154.93k £133.01k £118.73k
Total expenditure £222.80k £155.19k £144.19k £138.77k £136.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A