Financial history ST JOHNS PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity number: 1026648
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £98.02k £87.49k £87.63k £76.76k £73.79k
Total expenditure £101.01k £85.83k £75.14k £73.87k £76.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £77.31k £72.34k £66.86k £60.74k £61.43k