Accounts and annual returns ACNE SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 1026654
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 14 May 2008 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 14 May 2008 | 14 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 06 July 2005 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | 06 July 2005 | 67 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window