Accounts and annual returns PORTLAND WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1026741
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2008 13 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2007 25 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2006 28 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2005 15 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2004 14 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 Not Required