Financial history EMMAUS CHRISTIAN HEALING TRUST

Charity number: 1026842
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010
Total gross income £16.18k £17.58k £16.57k £13.89k £18.77k
Total expenditure £16.65k £16.90k £16.66k £14.60k £16.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A