Financial history WHITEWATER PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £19.94k £7.87k £4.49k £15.14k £16.42k
Total expenditure £9.96k £7.69k £17.00k £11.77k £23.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A