Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF BENFLEET CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1027116
Charity reporting is overdue by 376 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 376 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 376 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 July 2023 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 February 2023 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 February 2023 644 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required