Financial history SOUTH STREET PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027268
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £122.27k £144.66k £111.05k £113.38k £134.25k
Total expenditure £133.95k £123.88k £106.85k £123.05k £125.69k
Income from government contracts £99.51k £124.25k £93.52k £94.13k £119.52k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £1.00k £1.50k