Accounts and annual returns ST ALBANS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027275
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2014 10 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2013 14 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 14 November 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2012 18 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 21 April 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2011 05 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 05 March 2012 On Time