Financial history ISLAMIC SOCIETY FOR WALES

Charity number: 1027357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £57.55k £32.56k £57.55k £93.63k £101.99k
Total expenditure £47.96k £22.53k £47.96k £89.09k £94.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A