Financial history JACK AND JILL PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027362
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £44.88k £33.01k £40.02k £27.49k £50.62k
Total expenditure £40.00k £36.19k £39.77k £33.19k £46.05k
Income from government contracts £35.91k £22.78k £28.75k £24.15k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £35.56k