Financial history WANTAGE PRE - SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1027363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £104.02k £103.51k £123.91k £111.50k £144.31k
Total expenditure £87.66k £94.82k £114.49k £119.90k £141.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A