Accounts and annual returns SANDHAM MIDDLE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1027413
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 03 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 06 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 24 March 2005 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required