Trustees AYLESBURY MUSIC CENTRE PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1027423

Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Fiona Aldersea | Chair | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karl Grexhammer | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hood | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louis Stubbs | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suna Erdem | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Purchase | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Powell | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sam Bosompem | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Penny Hale | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Fay Hayhurst | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tom Horn | Trustee | 10 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.