Financial history ORTON WISTOW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1027473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.08k £4.64k £18.23k £27.76k £19.86k
Total expenditure £11.19k £9.50k £12.42k £14.34k £20.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £910 N/A N/A