Financial history SANDPIPER PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027673
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £54.45k £46.15k £41.38k £45.41k £47.35k
Total expenditure £56.98k £47.08k £36.96k £42.80k £58.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A