Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WESTFIELD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 January 2025 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 29 January 2025 549 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 July 2023 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 July 2023 727 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required