Financial history FIRST ACT THEATRE

Charity number: 1027875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.15k £7.14k £4.63k £13 £0
Total expenditure £13.08k £9.56k £6.08k £1.03k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A