Financial history PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION, CHUDLEIGH KNIGHTON (COFE) PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1028018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/09/2019 02/09/2020 02/09/2021 02/09/2022 02/09/2023
Total gross income £3.29k £1.10k £2.21k £1.94k £2.08k
Total expenditure £2.75k £1.35k £3.38k £1.54k £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A