Accounts and annual returns EAST HERTS AND HARLOW GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity number: 1028031
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2014 21 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2013 05 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 16 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required