Accounts and annual returns WISBECH ST MARY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1028194
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 January 2020 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 January 2020 193 days late
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 February 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 22 June 2017 On Time