Financial history CHESIL BANK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1028303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £40.54k £30.81k £31.56k £36.06k £46.59k
Total expenditure £29.30k £33.69k £34.71k £42.71k £43.51k
Income from government contracts £23.99k £23.56k £22.85k £28.90k N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k £2.67k N/A N/A £4.70k