Financial history HOLME HOUSE VISITORS' CENTRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1028595
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £50.48k £54.86k £56.19k £61.22k £59.24k
Total expenditure £52.35k £56.97k £55.94k £64.79k £58.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A