Accounts and annual returns SONNING COMMON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1028702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2022 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 October 2022 260 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 June 2022 513 days late Download Open in new window