Accounts and annual returns BRIZE NORTON VILLAGE PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1028833
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 August 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 August 2024 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 February 2024 243 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 February 2024 243 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 November 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 November 2022 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 September 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 September 2021 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 July 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 July 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window