Trustees PRE-SCHOOL 3 4 5 (BEESTON)

Charity number: 1029096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Lister Chair 18 April 2023
None on record
Michael Kemp Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Rebecca Holgate Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Alison Tilson Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Rosanna McCarron Trustee 06 November 2023
None on record
Sarah Wells Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record