Financial history TOLLESHUNT KNIGHTS CO-OPERATIVE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1029105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £91.20k £76.36k £127.18k £115.77k £123.48k
Total expenditure £87.42k £89.99k £107.12k £117.84k £121.01k
Income from government contracts N/A £55.08k £85.54k £87.64k N/A
Income from government grants £68.58k N/A N/A N/A £85.45k